+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On June 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-316.
- Signed by President.
On May 31, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 24, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 24, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 16, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and held at the desk. Pending further disposition.
On May 14, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House as D.C. Business.
On May 8, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 422.
- Reported to House by House Committee on District of Columbia. Report No: 98-736.
On May 3, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 30, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor