+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On September 13, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 7, 1990 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Prior to Referral .
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On July 27, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 26, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 23, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
On July 18, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor