+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On November 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
On September 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition.
On August 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On August 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7049)
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, the Budget, Veterans' Affairs, Armed Services, the Judiciary, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor