+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 12, 1986 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure.
On May 7, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 6, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On April 17, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 26.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 99-544.
On January 7, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor