+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 13, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-305.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 5, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 4, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 2, 2000 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-922 .
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 292.
- Mr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5284 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8559
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 27, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 26, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, Hazardous Materials and Pipeline Transportation.
On September 25, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor