+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On May 7, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On April 24, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 394.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs. Report No: 98-695.
On April 10, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 3, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy.
On March 28, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor