+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On November 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On October 20, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On September 21, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA.
On September 19, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On September 13, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor