+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 19, 1976 in the Senate:
- Motion to override veto failed of passage in Senate, roll call #41 .
On February 19, 1976 in the House:
- Motion to override veto passed House, roll call #62 .
On February 16, 1976 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by President, H. Doc. 94-367.
On February 2, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On February 2, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On January 29, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #27 .
On December 17, 1975 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On December 16, 1975 in the House:
- House considered conference report.
On December 15, 1975 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-563.
On December 15, 1975 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-733.
On November 13, 1975 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On November 11, 1975 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On July 29, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 1587 , roll call #348 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Committee on Public Works discharged in Senate.
On May 21, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Public Works.
On May 20, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #227 .
- Motion to recommit to Committee on Public Works failed of passage in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 12, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 94-203.
On March 20, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor