+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5049-5051)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5228.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5049-5052)
- Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Frank Pallone, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor