+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On August 25, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
On July 20, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On June 1, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Stabilization.
On May 27, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Investigations.
On May 20, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor