+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 8, 1988 in the House:
- For Further Action See S.2752 .
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Failed to Receive 2/3's Vote to Suspend and Pass by Yea-Nay Vote: 223 - 195 .
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-1033 .
On September 28, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Justice.
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On August 25, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On August 11, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor