+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 9, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure withdrawn from consideration and returned to calendar in Senate.
- Cloture motion on measure rejected in Senate, roll call #511 .
On December 5, 1980 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion filed in Senate on Measure.
- Senate considered motion to proceed to consideration.
On December 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Motion to table motion to proceed to consider rejected in Senate, roll call #506 .
- Cloture motion in Senate on motion to proceed to consider, roll call #504 .
On December 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to consider .
- Cloture motion on motion to proceed to consider rejected in Senate, roll call #500 .
On December 2, 1980 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to consider .
On December 1, 1980 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to conside.
- Senate began consideration of a motion to proceed to consider.
On November 20, 1980 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
On June 12, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #315 .
- Motion to recommit to Committee on the Judiciary with instructions rejected in House, roll call #314 .
- Measure considered in House.
On June 11, 1980 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On April 1, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 96-865.
On September 6, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor