+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On September 16, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Select Education.
On August 23, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On August 18, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
On August 17, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
On August 8, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor