+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On December 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-174.
- Signed by President.
On December 24, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 21, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 20, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 20, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On December 17, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On November 29, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 96-674.
On September 5, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor