+ − Summary
+ − Actions (21)
On October 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-464.
- Signed by President.
On September 23, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 20, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 922.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. With written report No. 100-501.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On June 15, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
On June 4, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 4.
- Placed on House Calendar No: 38.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 100-130.
On June 3, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources Discharged.
On February 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On January 7, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor