+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Monetary Policy and Trade.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property, Competition and the Internet.
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology and Innovation.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor