+ − Actions (25)
On December 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 97-119.
On December 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- S.UP.AMDT.799 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46-44. Record Vote No: 492.
- S.UP.AMDT.798 Proposed by Senator Dole. Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
- S.UP.AMDT.799 Proposed by Senator Dole. Relating to travel expenses while away from home.
- S.UP.AMDT.798 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56-36. Record Vote No: 493.
- S.UP.AMDT.800 Proposed by Senator Hatch. To amend the Black Lung Benefits Act.
- S.UP.AMDT.800 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 63-30. Record Vote No: 494.
On December 16, 1981 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Yea-Nay Vote: 363 - 47 .
- Cleared for White House.
On December 15, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 424.
- Received in the Senate.
On December 15, 1981 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- House Committee on Education and Labor Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
On December 14, 1981 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Ways and Means. Report No: 97-406 .
On December 10, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Hearings Held by House Committee on Ways and Means Prior to Introduction .
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Amendments (3)
S.UP.AMDT.798
Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
S.UP.AMDT.799
Relating to travel expenses while away from home.
S.UP.AMDT.800
To amend the Black Lung Benefits Act.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor