+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On October 10, 1990 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science, Space and Technology. H. Rept. 101-826, Part I.
On August 4, 1990 in the House:
- PERMISSION TO FILE REPORT - Mr. Roe asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology have permission to file a report on H.R. 5155 during the August/September District Work Period. Agreed to without objection.
On July 16, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On June 27, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor