+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On October 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On October 6, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 1, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 49.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-946.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 30, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 26, 1986 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On July 31, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands.
On June 26, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor