+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 16, 2016 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-295. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7103)
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 677.
- Senate vitiated previous passage. (consideration: CR S6688, S6716)
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6684)
On November 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 677.
On September 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5673)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5150.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5673)
- Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 15, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor