+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On October 4, 1992 in the House:
- By request of Mr. Boucher the House passed over the measure without prejudice.
On September 15, 1992 in the House:
- By request of Mr. Boucher the House passed over the measure without prejudice.
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
On September 9, 1992 in the House:
- Text of Measure Incorporated into H.R.4484 .
On August 6, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 39.
- Reported by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 102-795.
On July 1, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On June 18, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On May 20, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
On May 12, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor