+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 16, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-600.
- Signed by President.
On November 6, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 5, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 27, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 27, 1990 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Williams asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
On October 25, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3149 Amendment SP 3149 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 3149 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3149 Proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Pell. To establish a center for Commerce and Industrial Expansion at Loyola University of Chicago and for other purposes.
- Amendment SP 3149 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Pell.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On August 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 767.
- Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 12, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
On July 10, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Goodling demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- Mr. Serrano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 6, 1990 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 356.
- Reported by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 101-574.
On June 28, 1990 in the House:
- Mr. Hawkins asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Education and Labor have until 5:00 p.m. on July 6 to file a report on H.R. 5140 . Agreed to without objection.
On June 27, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On June 21, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3149
To establish a center for Commerce and Industrial Expansion at Loyola University of Chicago and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor