+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 1995 in the House:
- Other Measure, H.R. 1555 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 12, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance.
On January 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor