+ − Summary
+ − Actions (25)
On October 1, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On September 30, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 29, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537.
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-939, Part II.
- Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 102-939, Part I.
On September 23, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 11, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 20, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On July 14, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On June 2, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On May 13, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy.
On May 7, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor