+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 7, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2577 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3423 Amendment SP 3423 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 3423 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3423 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Garn. To make technical corrections.
- Amendment SP 3423 proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Garn.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 29, 1992 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-945.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 540.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 29, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 758.
On September 16, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 10, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On June 16, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On May 7, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3423
To make technical corrections.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor