+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-226.
- Signed by President.
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6305-6306)
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 595.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7277)
- Mr. Stivers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5106.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7277)
On July 24, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor