+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 5, 1992 in the House:
- See H.R.11 .
On July 29, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-1065.
On July 22, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Hearings held.
On July 21, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On July 8, 1992 in the House:
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 510 , the Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of debate on the Gephardt amendments en bloc.
- Rule H. Res. 510 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 510 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5100 with 1 hour and 30 minutes of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule. All points of order against said substitute are waived. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 510 and Rule XXIII.
- GENERAL DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 510 , the Committee of the Whole proceeded with ninety minutes of general debate.
- H.AMDT.688 Amendments offered by Mr. Gephardt. Amendments en bloc request the U.S. Trade Representative to negotiate a comprehensive auto sector agreement with Japan, including the continuation of the current voluntary restraint agreement; and extend for 5 years the authority for the Auto Parts Advisory Committee.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Tim Valentine to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- H.AMDT.688 On agreeing to the Gephardt amendments Agreed to by recorded vote: 260 - 166 .
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 5100 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- Mr. Archer moved to recommit to Ways and Means.
- The previous question was ordered without objection.
- On motion to recommit Failed by voice vote.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 145 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 2, 1992 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 510 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5100 with 1 hour and 30 minutes of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule. All points of order against said substitute are waived. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
On June 23, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 102-607.
On June 16, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 9, 1992 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 3, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 14, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 8, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On May 7, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.688
Amendments en bloc request the U.S. Trade Representative to negotiate a comprehensive auto sector agreement with Japan, including the continuation of the current voluntary restraint agreement; and extend for 5 years the authority for the Auto Parts Advisory Committee.
+ − Vote
July 8, 1992: On Agreeing to the Amendment
- Yeas: 260
- Nays: 166
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor