+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
On May 4, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by voice vote.
- Considered from the Private Calendar.
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
On March 17, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 2.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-68 .
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor