+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 26, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 277 - 131 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On September 25, 2006 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5092 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 21, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-672 .
On September 7, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor