+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 28, 1990 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3229 Amendment SP 3229 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 3229 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3229 Proposed by Senator Simpson for Senator Wallop. In the nature of a substitute.
- Amendment SP 3229 proposed by Senator Simpson for Senator Wallop.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 27, 1990 in the House:
- Provisions Included In H.R.2570 .
On October 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 905.
On October 1, 1990 in the House:
- Mr. Rhodes demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 487.
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-778.
- Mr. Richardson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On August 3, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On July 17, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On June 14, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3229
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor