+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 27, 1992 in the House:
- Pocket Vetoed by President.
On October 15, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 9, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 8, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On August 11, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On August 10, 1992 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-820.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 465.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 29, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On July 23, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On July 9, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 2, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On May 5, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor