+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 3, 1985 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-166.
- Signed by President.
On November 22, 1985 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 20, 1985 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 14, 1985 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 14, 1985 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On November 13, 1985 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment, with further amendents, agreed to in the Senate by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.966 Amendment SP 966 , as modified, agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.967 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.966 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.967 Amendment SP 967 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
On November 6, 1985 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.967 Proposed by Senator Cranston for Senator Chiles to Amendment SP 966. To provide that the Administrator of the Veterans' Administration shall not be required to provide a feasibility plan with respect to the purchase of a facility that would have the effect of making it infeasible to construct, acquire, or lease a medical facility in the Northern Florida panhandle to furnish health care to veterans in that area.
- S.AMDT.966 Proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Denton. To provide a feasibility plan for the purchase of a facility for furnishing hospital and nursing home care.
On October 30, 1985 in the Senate:
- House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On July 30, 1985 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 876 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 876 amended.
On May 23, 1985 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and held at the desk by unanimous consent. Pending further disposition.
On May 21, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 15, 1985 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 72.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-114.
On May 7, 1985 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 2, 1985 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 25, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
On March 8, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From VA.
On January 14, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from VA.
On January 7, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.966
To provide a feasibility plan for the purchase of a facility for furnishing hospital and nursing home care.
S.AMDT.967
To provide that the Administrator of the Veterans' Administration shall not be required to provide a feasibility plan with respect to the purchase of a facility that would have the effect of making it infeasible to construct, acquire, or lease a medical facility in the Northern Florida panhandle to furnish health care to veterans in that area.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor