+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On October 5, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On October 3, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and Competitiveness.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On September 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On September 15, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel.
On September 13, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
On August 9, 1994 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor