+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 17, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 323.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-567 .
On May 17, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 15.
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor