+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-552.
On December 15, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 14, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 17, 2000 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Ose moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5016 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On October 4, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 11, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On July 27, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor