+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 14, 1990 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 101-545.
On November 9, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 30, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 27, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 27, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 924.
On October 1, 1990 in the House:
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. McCloskey moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On September 26, 1990 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 161.
- Reported by the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. H. Rept. 101-756.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 12, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor