+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-124. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236)
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10282-10285)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10282-10286)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4998.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 281.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-352.
- Mr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House