+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4623-4625)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4995.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4623-4626)
- Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-514.
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
On September 9, 2019 in the House:
- Hearings Held Prior to Introduction and Referral.
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor