+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 15, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-519.
- Signed by President.
On November 14, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 316 - 72, 1 Present .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
On November 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Mr. Archer moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On November 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4356 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4356 Amendment SA 4356 proposed by Senator Lott. In the nature of a substitute.
- Committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 817.
- Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Roth with amendments. With written report No. 106-416 .
On September 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On September 13, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote : 315 - 109, 1 Present .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 500.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-845 .
On September 12, 2000 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Sept. 13.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4986 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Archer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 27, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 1.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4356
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Vote
September 13, 2000: Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended
- Yeas: 315
- Nays: 109
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor