+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 27, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 744. By unanimous consent.
On July 25, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 17, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 347 - 19 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On July 16, 1990 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until July 17.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. Sawyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 6, 1990 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
- Reported by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 101-571.
On June 28, 1990 in the House:
- Mr. Hawkins asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Education and Labor have until 5:00 p.m. on July 6 to file a report on H.R. 4982 . Agreed to without objection.
On June 27, 1990 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 6, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor