+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On December 22, 1980 in the House:
- Private Law 96-109.
- Signed by President.
On December 15, 1980 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 12, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 12, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On August 21, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On August 19, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On July 24, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 96-1187.
On July 26, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor