+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2892-2893)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 496.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2892-2894)
- Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 445.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-575.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor