+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
On July 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On July 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On June 28, 2002 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 221 - 208 .
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 204 - 223 .
- Mr. Gephardt moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means and Energy and Commerce.
On June 27, 2002 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 465 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4954 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
- Rule H. Res. 465 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 465 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4954 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H.R. 4954 .
On June 26, 2002 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-539 , Part I.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 19, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred, pursuant to the order of the House of June 17, 2002, jointly to the Committees on Energy and Commerce and Ways and Means.
+ − Votes (2)
June 28, 2002: On Motion to Recommit with Instructions
- Yeas: 204
- Nays: 223
- Absent: 8
June 28, 2002: On Passage
- Yeas: 221
- Nays: 208
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor