+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On July 24, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4947 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 20, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 338.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-587 .
On June 21, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries and Oceans Discharged.
On May 10, 2006 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 20, 2006 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Oceans.
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor