+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On October 20, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 12, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-1079 .
On July 29, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On July 12, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On June 29, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 28, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor