+ − Actions (11)
On September 28, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, IRS.
On May 17, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 320.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 97-528.
On May 11, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations Discharged.
On March 31, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Labor.
On February 8, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 3, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 20, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On November 10, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor