+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On June 9, 2008 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4926 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Yarmuth moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
On December 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
On December 11, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor