+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-212.
- Signed by President.
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380.
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4911 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Keller moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor