+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 11, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 468.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
On October 4, 2002 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 11, 2002.
On October 1, 2002 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 4, 2002.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-714 , Part I.
On September 18, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 12, 2002 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 10, 2002 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 3, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 26, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On June 6, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor