+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Agriculture Department, OMB.
On August 13, 1986 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On August 11, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On August 8, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 470.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-777.
On August 6, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 5, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 17, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 6, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands.
On May 22, 1986 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 21, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor